EP0018265 - Machine, such as pump, of which at least some moving parts are in contact with sea-water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.1981 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRONZAVIA Société dite: 207 Boulevard Saint Denis F-92403 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/22] | For all designated states BRONZAVIA Société dite: 207 Boulevard Saint Denis F-92403 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonnin, Jean-François 207 Boulevard Saint Denis F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1980/22] | Representative(s) | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/22] | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 80400461.2 | 08.04.1980 | [1980/22] | Priority number, date | FR19790009019 | 19.04.1979 Original published format: FR 7909019 | [1980/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0018265 | Date: | 29.10.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1980 | Classification | IPC: | F04B15/04, F04B1/12, C23C7/00 | [1980/22] | CPC: |
F04B1/122 (EP);
C23C4/10 (EP);
F04B15/04 (EP);
F05C2201/0466 (EP);
F05C2201/0478 (EP);
F05C2253/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1980/22] | Title | German: | Maschine, wie zum Beispiel Pumpe, wovon mindestens einige bewegliche Teile in Berührung mit Meerwasser sind | [1980/22] | English: | Machine, such as pump, of which at least some moving parts are in contact with sea-water | [1980/22] | French: | Machine, telle que pompe, dont au moins certaines parties mobiles sont en contact avec l'eau de mer | [1980/22] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 24.04.1981 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1981/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH361478 [ ]; | US3212448 [ ]; | US3209701 [ ]; | US2709339 [ ]; | US3507584 [ ]; | DE1033028 [ ]; | FR1449397 [ ]; | US2964420 [ ] |