EP0018890 - Electrical insulating support with low thermal resistance, and base or box for power component, comprising such a support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1982/21] |
Former [1980/23] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Resneau, Jean-Claude "THOMSON-CSF" SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Doyen, Jean "THOMSON-CSF"SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 03 /
Ribier, Robert "THOMSON-CSF"SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1980/23] | Representative(s) | Giraud, Pierre, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann 75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/23] | Giraud, Pierre, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 80400549.4 | 23.04.1980 | [1980/23] | Priority number, date | FR19790011023 | 02.05.1979 Original published format: FR 7911023 | [1980/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0018890 | Date: | 12.11.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0018890 | Date: | 15.12.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/14, H01L23/48, C04B37/02 | [1980/23] | CPC: |
H01L23/3735 (EP,US);
C04B37/026 (EP,US);
H01L23/15 (EP,US);
C04B2237/122 (EP,US);
C04B2237/34 (EP,US);
C04B2237/407 (EP,US);
C04B2237/64 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3511 (EP,US);
Y10T403/217 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1980/23] | Title | German: | Elektrisch isolierender Träger mit niedrigem thermischem Widerstand und Basis oder Dose für eine Leistungskomponente, die einen solchen Träger aufweist | [1980/23] | English: | Electrical insulating support with low thermal resistance, and base or box for power component, comprising such a support | [1980/23] | French: | Support isolateur électrique, à faible résistance thermique, et embase ou boîtier pour composant de puissance comportant un tel support | [1980/23] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/05] | 02.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.09.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.06.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB903824 [ ] (ASS ELECT IND); | FR1372216 [ ] (ASEA AB); | FR1376243 [ ] (THOMSON HOUSTON COMP FRANCAISE); | DE1439905 [ ] (WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE & SIGNAL); | US4042952 [ ] (KRAYBILL ALBERT VICTOR); | EP0009978 [ ] (HITACHI LTD [JP]) |