EP0018914 - Window lifting mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): SE State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAUMELLERIE ELECTRIQUE Société dite: La Rivière de Mansac F-19600 Larche / FR | [1980/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saigne, Gérard La Rivière de Mansac 19600 Larche / FR | [1980/23] | Representative(s) | Lavoix, Jean, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place D'Estienne D'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [1980/23] | Application number, filing date | 80400597.3 | 30.04.1980 | [1980/23] | Priority number, date | FR19790011302 | 04.05.1979 Original published format: FR 7911302 | [1980/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0018914 | Date: | 12.11.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0018914 | Date: | 07.03.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1980 | Classification | IPC: | E05F11/40, E05F15/16 | [1980/23] | CPC: |
E05F11/405 (EP,US);
E05F11/445 (EP,US);
E05F15/689 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/23] | Title | German: | Fensterheber | [1980/23] | English: | Window lifting mechanism | [1980/23] | French: | Lève-glace | [1980/23] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/27] | 26.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 16.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.05.1983 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.05.1983 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 07.03.1984 | SE | 07.03.1984 | [2003/06] |
Former [1989/38] | SE | 07.03.1983 | |
NL | 07.03.1984 | ||
GB | 07.05.1984 | ||
Former [1985/23] | SE | 07.03.1983 | |
NL | 07.03.1984 | ||
Former [1984/33] | SE | 07.03.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | FR1264086 [ ] (WILMOT BREEDEN LTD); | US4098134 [ ] (KONDO OSAMU); | FR2307945 [ ] (KEIPER KG [DE]); | US2718395 [ ] (EHRLICH LOUIS B) |