EP0020205 - Device for synchronizing a clock signal and synchronous data transmission system comprising such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1984 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.1984 [1984/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1982/21] |
Former [1980/25] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dautremay, Alain "THOMSON-CSF"-SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Boljevic, Jean-Marc "THOMSON-CSF"-SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1983/28] |
Former [1980/25] | 01 /
Dautremay, Alain "THOMSON-CSF"-SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-753 Paris Cedex 087 / FR | ||
02 /
Boljevic, Jean-Marc "THOMSON-CSF"-SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Representative(s) | Turlèque, Clotilde, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud 92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/25] | Turlèque, Clotilde, et al THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 80400611.2 | 06.05.1980 | [1980/25] | Priority number, date | FR19790014178 | 01.06.1979 Original published format: FR 7914178 | [1980/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0020205 | Date: | 10.12.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0020205 | Date: | 13.07.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/02 | [1980/25] | CPC: |
H04L7/0331 (EP,US);
H04L7/0004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/25] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Synchronisierung eines Taktsignals und synchrones Datenübertragungssystem mit einer solchen Vorrichtung | [1980/25] | English: | Device for synchronizing a clock signal and synchronous data transmission system comprising such a device | [1980/25] | French: | Dispositif de synchronisation d'un signal d'horloge et système de transmission de données synchrones comportant un tel dispositif | [1980/25] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1981 | Examination requested [1981/29] | 03.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1122790 [ ] (THOMSON HOUSTON COMP FRANCAISE); | [A]US3440547 (HOUCKE GEORGE P); | US3562661 [ ] (CRUMB DANA F, et al); | [A]FR2301964 (TELECOMMUNICATIONS SA [FR]) |