EP0019525 - Torsion damping device, in particular a friction clutch plate especially for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.1984 [1984/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO 64 Avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/24] | For all designated states VALEO 64 Avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loizeau, Pierre 1 Allée de l'Albain F-92140 Ville D'Avray / FR | [1980/24] | Representative(s) | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 12, Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/24] | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 95 Boulevard Beaumarchais F-75003 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 80400629.4 | 09.05.1980 | [1980/24] | Priority number, date | FR19790011968 | 11.05.1979 Original published format: FR 7911968 | [1980/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0019525 | Date: | 26.11.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0019525 | Date: | 08.06.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1980 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/12, F16D13/68 | [1980/24] | CPC: |
F16F15/1202 (EP,US);
F16F15/12306 (EP,US);
F16F15/12353 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1980/24] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Dämpfen der Drehschwingungen, insbesondere der Kupplungsscheibe eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [1980/24] | English: | Torsion damping device, in particular a friction clutch plate especially for a motor vehicle | [1980/24] | French: | Dispositif amortisseur de torsion, en particulier friction d'embrayage, notamment pour véhicule automobile | [1980/24] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1981 | Examination requested [1981/37] | 13.09.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.12.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.06.1981 | M02   Fee paid on   30.06.1981 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR903072 [ ] (PHILIPS NV); | FR1081958 [ ]; | US3296887 [ ] (LARSEN HUGH W); | US3421343 [ ] (WISEMAN WILLIAM A); | DE1941813 [ ] (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | US3811545 [ ] (SATO K, et al) |