EP0019538 - Sludge settling and thickening apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.1982 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTHOM-ATLANTIQUE Société anonyme dite: 38, Avenue Kléber F-75784 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | [1980/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ghaleb, Khalil 62, avenue du Vercors F-38170 Seyssinet / FR | [1980/24] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/24] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 80400654.2 | 12.05.1980 | [1980/24] | Priority number, date | FR19790012189 | 14.05.1979 Original published format: FR 7912189 | [1980/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0019538 | Date: | 26.11.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B01D21/00, B30B9/18 | [1980/24] | CPC: |
B30B9/18 (EP);
B01D29/118 (EP);
B01D29/6476 (EP);
B01D29/828 (EP);
B01D29/90 (EP);
B01D36/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1980/24] | Title | German: | Dekanter und Eindicker für Schlämme | [1980/24] | English: | Sludge settling and thickening apparatus | [1980/24] | French: | Décanteur épaississeur de boue | [1980/24] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 15.05.1981 | Examination requested [1981/30] | 12.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1983/02] | 07.10.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1982 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR365686 [ ] (& EISENGIESSEREI MASCHF [FR]); | US1624385 [ ] (BERGEN HAROLD E); | FR845493 [ ]; | FR1401378 [ ]; | BE666486 [ ]; | FR2138968 [ ] (KRUPP GMBH); | FR2197803 [ ] (ZYKLOS METALLBAU KG [DE]); | FR2207872 [ ] (SOGREAH [FR]); | FR2321456 [ ] (ALSTHOM CGEE [FR]) |