25.07.2008 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
05.10.2005 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
21.09.2002 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] |
02.11.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2001 [2001/51] |
26.01.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] |
12.01.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] |
05.01.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] |
23.06.2000 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] |
20.06.2000 |
Change - appeal |
|
15.06.2000 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
11.01.2000 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
07.09.1999 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
25.02.1999 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
09.01.1996 |
Change - appeal |
|
22.01.1994 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.03.1994 [1994/11] |
20.10.1993 |
Opposition filed |
published on 08.12.1993 [1993/49] |
13.10.1993 |
Opposition filed |
published on 01.12.1993 [1993/48] |
08.01.1993 |
Change - applicant |
published on 03.03.1993 [1993/09] |
27.11.1992 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.01.1993 [1993/02] |
07.03.1991 |
First examination report |
|
20.01.1984 |
Change - applicant |
published on 21.03.1984 [1984/12] |
22.09.1981 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.11.1981 [1981/47] |
19.03.1981 |
Publication of search report |
published on 20.05.1981 [1981/20] |
14.10.1980 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.12.1980 [1980/25] |