Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE84572T | 15.01.1993 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US4190979 | 24.05.1979 | EP80400722 | 23.05.1980 | US10726779 | 26.12.1979 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4935235 | 19.06.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US4190979 | 24.05.1979 | US12722887 | 01.12.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5196194 | 23.03.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US4190979 | 24.05.1979 | US10726779 | 26.12.1979 | US67962184 | 07.12.1984 | US51305583 | 12.07.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5436139 | 25.07.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US4190979 | 24.05.1979 | US10726779 | 26.12.1979 | US8999393 | 08.07.1993 | US51305583 | 12.07.1983 | US57133190 | 22.08.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1341645 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2024 | C | Priority number | Date | US4190979 | 24.05.1979 | US10726779 | 26.12.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1341643 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2023 | C | Priority number | Date | US4190979 | 24.05.1979 | US10726779 | 26.12.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0020251 | Global Dossier | 13.01.1993 | B1 | EP0020251 | 20.05.1981 | A3 | EP0020251 | 10.12.1980 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US4190979 | 24.05.1979 | US10726779 | 26.12.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE20251T | 27.02.1986 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US4190979 | 24.05.1979 | US10726779 | 26.12.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3072205T | 05.08.1993 | T2 | DE3072205D1 | 25.02.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US4190979 | 24.05.1979 | US10726779 | 26.12.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK226680 | 25.11.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | US4190979 | 24.05.1979 | US10726779 | 26.12.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8105388 | 16.05.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4190979 | 24.05.1979 | US10726779 | 26.12.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR68524 | 11.01.1982 | B | Priority number | Date | US4190979 | 24.05.1979 | US10726779 | 26.12.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IE52036 | 27.05.1987 | B1 | IE800991L | 24.11.1980 | L | Priority number | Date | US4190979 | 24.05.1979 | US10726779 | 26.12.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2543751B | 16.10.1996 | B2 | JPH02450 | 05.01.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US4190979 | 24.05.1979 | US10726779 | 26.12.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0659221B | 10.08.1994 | B2 | JPS5663995 | 30.05.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | US4190979 | 24.05.1979 | US10726779 | 26.12.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT71296 | 21.09.1981 | B | PT71296 | 01.06.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | US4190979 | 24.05.1979 | US10726779 | 26.12.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | YU46343 | 20.10.1993 | B | YU140380 | 31.10.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US4190979 | 24.05.1979 | US10726779 | 26.12.1979 |