EP0020251 - DNA transfer vector, host transformed with it, vaccine, and their production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 300 Lakeside Drive 22nd Floor Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 300 Lakeside Drive, 22nd Floor Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US | ||
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA Office of Technology Licensing, 2150 Shattuck Avenue, Suite 510 Berkeley, California 94704-1318 / US | ||
Former [1984/12] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 2199 Addison Street Berkeley, California 94720 / US | ||
Former [1980/25] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 2200 University Avenue Berkeley, California 94720 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rutter, William J. 80 Everson Street San Francisco California 94131 / US | 02 /
Goodman, Howard Michael 3006 Clay Street San Francisco California 94127 / US | [1980/25] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/25] | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 80400722.7 | 23.05.1980 | [1980/25] | Priority number, date | US19790041909 | 24.05.1979 Original published format: US 41909 | US19790107267 | 26.12.1979 Original published format: US 107267 | [1980/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0020251 | Date: | 10.12.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0020251 | Date: | 20.05.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0020251 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/51, C12P21/00, A61K39/29 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C12N2730/10122 (EP,US);
C12R2001/19 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C12P21/02, C12N1/205 (US,EP);
C12P21/02, C12R2001/19 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1980/25] | C12N15/00, C12P21/02, A61K39/29 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1980/25] | Title | German: | DNS-Transfer-Vektor, damit transformierter Wirt, Impfstoff und ihre Herstellung | [1980/25] | English: | DNA transfer vector, host transformed with it, vaccine, and their production | [1980/25] | French: | Vecteur de transfert d'ADN, hôte transformé par celui-ci, vaccin, et leur production | [1980/25] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 18.09.1981 | Examination requested [1981/47] | 13.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 06.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 26.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 02.02.1987 | Appeal received | 07.04.1987 | Statement of grounds filed | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.10.1993
21.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Medeva PLC Marcol Ho. 293 Regent St. London W1R 7PD / GB Opponent's representative Holmes, Michael John Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | 02
13.10.1993
02.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE Institut Pasteur 25-28 rue du dr. Roux FR-75015 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Gutmann, Ernest Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.10.1993
21.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Medeva PLC Marcol Ho. 293 Regent St. London W1R 7PD / GB Opponent's representative Holmes, Michael John Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | ||
02
13.10.1993
02.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE Institut Pasteur 25-28 rue du dr. Roux FR-75015 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Gutmann, Ernest Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | |||
Former [1993/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.10.1993
21.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Medeva PLC Marcol Ho. 293 Regent St. London W1R 7PD / GB Opponent's representative Holmes, Michael John Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | ||
02
13.10.1993
02.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE Institut Pasteur 25-28 rue du dr. Roux FR-75015 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Gutmann, Ernest Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
Former [1993/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.10.1993
21.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Medeva PLC Marcol Ho. 293 Regent St. London W1R 7PD / GB Opponent's representative Holmes, Michael John Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | 25.10.1993 | No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 12.11.1993 | No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 26.11.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.07.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.07.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.08.1995 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 15.06.2000 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2000/32] | Appeal following opposition | 17.10.1995 | Appeal received No. T0877/95 | 21.12.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.06.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 22.05.2000 | AT | 23.05.2000 | LU | 23.05.2000 | NL | 23.05.2000 | CH | 31.05.2000 | LI | 31.05.2000 | [2002/45] |
Former [2001/51] | CH | 13.01.1993 | |
LI | 13.01.1993 | ||
GB | 22.05.2000 | ||
AT | 23.05.2000 | ||
LU | 23.05.2000 | ||
NL | 23.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | GB | 22.05.2000 | |
AT | 23.05.2000 | ||
LU | 23.05.2000 | ||
NL | 23.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | GB | 22.05.2000 | |
AT | 23.05.2000 | ||
NL | 23.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 23.05.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]FR2444713 (PASTEUR INSTITUT); | [E]EP0013828 (BIOGEN NV [NL]) | Examination | EP0128733 |