EP0021888 - Monitor for maintenance station and maintenance station comprising it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1984 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.1984 [1984/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1982/21] |
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cerf, Jean "THOMSON-CSF" - SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Bertrand, Jean-Pierre "THOMSON-CSF" - SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Benoit, Monique, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/29] | Benoit, Monique, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1981/01] | Eisenbeth, Jacques Pierre THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 80400747.4 | 28.05.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | FR19790014721 | 08.06.1979 Original published format: FR 7914721 | [1981/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0021888 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0021888 | Date: | 12.10.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/20 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
G05B19/042 (EP);
G05B2219/24019 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/01] | Title | German: | Monitor für Wartungsstation und ihn enthaltende Wartungsstation | [1981/01] | English: | Monitor for maintenance station and maintenance station comprising it | [1981/01] | French: | Moniteur de station de maintenance, et station de maintenance le comportant | [1983/41] |
Former [1981/01] | Moniteur de station de maintenance, et station de maintenance le comprenant | Examination procedure | 21.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/14] | 23.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3992092 | [X] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON AEROSPACE AND ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS, vol. AES13, no. 3, mai 1977, New York, USA, RING: "A distibuted intelligence automatic test system for patriot", pages 264-272. | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 21, no. 1, juin 1978, New York, USA, RING et al.: "Data processor diagnostic test system", pages 115-117. | Examination | - ELEKTRONIK. Bd. 23. Heft 2. 1974, Ing. Otto Limann. pp. 64-66 | - FELTRON, Microcomputer-Information Gruppe 3.7.1.2/Hewlett-Packard 15.5.1978. | - FELTRON, Microcomputer-Information Gruppe 3.7.1-6/Texas Instruments 15.1.1978 |