EP0021913 - Face commutator for an electric machine, especially for automotive vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.1981 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DUCELLIER & Cie Echat 950 F-94024 Créteil Cedex / FR | [1981/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larrauri, Alexandre Les Costilles F-63570 Brassac Les Mines / FR | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Habert, Roger, et al VALEO Service Propriété Industrielle 21 rue Auguste Blanqui F-93406 Saint-Ouen / FR | [1983/10] |
Former [1981/01] | Habert, Roger c/o Ducellier & Cie 2, rue Boulle Echat 950 F-94024 Créteil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 80400795.3 | 04.06.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | FR19790015095 | 13.06.1979 Original published format: FR 7915095 | [1981/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0021913 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01R39/06, H01R43/06, H01R43/08 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
H01R39/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1981/01] | Title | German: | Stirnkollektor für elektrische Maschine, insbesondere Kraftfahrzeugmaschine | [1981/01] | English: | Face commutator for an electric machine, especially for automotive vehicles | [1981/01] | French: | Collecteur frontal pour machine électrique équipant notamment les véhicules automobiles | [1981/01] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 15.09.1981 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1981/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2378383 [ ]; | US1159990 [ ]; | FR2394906 [ ]; | GB1127069 [ ]; | US3414970 [ ] |