EP0021960 - Device to connect at least two linear elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.1982 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECHNIFLORE 5bis rue d'Ablon 91200 Athis-Mons, Essonne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states TECHNIFLORE 5bis rue d'Ablon F-91200 Athis-Mons, Essonne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charrier, Philippe Marie 13 rue Marie Stuart F-75002 Paris / FR | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Lepeudry-Gautherat, Thérèse, et al Lepeudry et Associés 43 Rue de la Brèche aux Loups 75012 Paris / FR | [2009/30] |
Former [1981/01] | Lepeudry-Gautherat, Thérèse, et al Armengaud Jeune Cabinet Lepeudry 52, avenue Daumesnil F-75012 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 80400857.1 | 13.06.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | FR19790015344 | 15.06.1979 Original published format: FR 7915344 | [1981/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0021960 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0021960 | Date: | 04.02.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/04, A01G17/14, E04G7/18, E04C5/16 | [1981/05] | CPC: |
A01G17/14 (EP);
E04C5/166 (EP);
E04G7/18 (EP);
F16B7/0493 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1981/04] | F16B7/04, E04G7/18, F16B7/04, E04C5/16 | ||
Former IPC [1981/01] | A01G17/14, E04G7/18, F16B7/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/01] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verbinden von mindestens zwei linearen Elementen | [1981/01] | English: | Device to connect at least two linear elements | [1981/01] | French: | Dispositif pour solidariser au moins deux éléments linéaires | [1981/01] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 30.10.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1982/14] | 12.01.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB927624 |