EP0022398 - Automatic device for blasting hollow workpieces of large dimensions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUTELEC LUCHAIRE EQUIPEMENT 9, rue Barbès F-93100 Montreuil / FR | [1981/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sandillon, Bernard 14, Rue de Saintonge Maurepas F-78190 Trappes / FR | [1981/02] | Representative(s) | De Boisse, Louis 37, Avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt F-75008 Paris / FR | [1981/02] | Application number, filing date | 80400953.8 | 25.06.1980 | [1981/02] | Priority number, date | FR19790017754 | 09.07.1979 Original published format: FR 7917754 | [1981/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0022398 | Date: | 14.01.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B24C3/32 | [1981/02] | CPC: |
B24C3/00 (EP,US);
B24C3/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/02] | Title | German: | Automatische Vorrichtung zum Sandstrahlen grosser hohler Werkstücke | [1981/02] | English: | Automatic device for blasting hollow workpieces of large dimensions | [1981/02] | French: | Dispositif automatique pour grenailler des pièces creuses de grandes dimensions | [1981/02] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 05.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/16] | 12.07.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.10.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB817711 [ ] (BASON & SONS LTD); | US2982007 [ ] (FUCHS HENRY O, et al); | US3521406 [ ] (CARPENTER JAMES H JR); | US3523391 [ ] (LEVINSON LOUIS E, et al); | FR2121119 [ ] (CONDECO AUTOMATION); | FR2127569 [ ] (BADISCHE MASCHF GMBH) |