EP0022403 - Gauge setting device for metal sheet forming or shearing machine tools [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1984 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.1984 [1984/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROMECAM SISSON-LEHMANN 63, rue de Strasbourg 93206 Saint-Denis Cédex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/02] | For all designated states PROMECAM SISSON-LEHMANN 63, rue de Strasbourg F-93206 Saint-Denis Cédex 1 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cros, Pierre Georges 92, rue Tahere F-92210 Saint-Cloud / FR | [1981/02] | Representative(s) | Tony-Durand, Serge Cabinet Tony-Durand 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | [1981/02] | Application number, filing date | 80400991.8 | 01.07.1980 | [1981/02] | Priority number, date | FR19790017458 | 05.07.1979 Original published format: FR 7917458 | [1981/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0022403 | Date: | 14.01.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0022403 | Date: | 21.09.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B23D33/10, // B21D5/00 | [1981/02] | CPC: |
B21D5/002 (EP,US);
B23D33/10 (EP,US);
Y10T83/76 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/02] | Title | German: | Schienenrichtvorrichtung für Werkzeugmaschinen zum Blechformen oder -schneiden | [1981/02] | English: | Gauge setting device for metal sheet forming or shearing machine tools | [1981/02] | French: | Dispositif indicateur de cote destiné à équiper une machine-outil de formage ou de cisaillage de métaux en feuilles | [1981/02] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1981 | Examination requested [1981/31] | 11.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.02.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 21.09.1983 | [1984/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2921377 (HOHL ROBERT W); | [A]FR2114032 (PROMECAN SISSON LEHMANN) |