EP0024222 - Process of manufacturing a field-effect transistor with self-aligned SCHOTTKY-Gate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/08] | Field effect transistor with a self-aligned Schottky gate and process for its manufacture | ||
[1983/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.1984 [1984/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1982/21] |
Former [1981/08] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tonnel, Eugène "THOMSON - CSF"- SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1981/08] | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle 92045 Paris La Défense Cédex 67 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/08] | de Beaumont, Michel, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI F-92045 PARIS LA DEFENSE CEDEX 67 / FR | Application number, filing date | 80401084.1 | 22.07.1980 | [1981/08] | Priority number, date | FR19790019424 | 27.07.1979 Original published format: FR 7919424 | [1981/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0024222 | Date: | 25.02.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0024222 | Date: | 16.11.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/28, H01L21/00, H01L29/80, H01L27/18 | [1981/08] | CPC: |
H01L21/033 (EP);
H01L27/095 (EP);
H01L29/66848 (EP);
H01L29/812 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/35] |
Former [1981/08] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Feldeffekttransistors mit selbstjustiertem SCHOTTKY-Gate | [1983/46] | English: | Process of manufacturing a field-effect transistor with self-aligned SCHOTTKY-Gate | [1983/46] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un transistor à effet de champ à grille SCHOTTKY autoalignée | [1983/46] |
Former [1981/08] | Feldeffekttransistor mit selbstaligniertem Schottky-Gate und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | ||
Former [1981/08] | Field effect transistor with a self-aligned Schottky gate and process for its manufacture | ||
Former [1981/08] | Transistor à effet de champ à grille Schottky autoalignée et son procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 06.03.1981 | Examination requested [1981/20] | 26.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.02.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.05.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0011477 [ ]; | EP0013342 [ ]; | EP0005351 [ ]; | FR2094036 [ ] | [ ] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, Vol. SC-12, No. 5, Octobre 1977 New York US T.J. RODGERS et al.: "iota-MOS-Memory Technology", pages 515-524 * Figure 1 * | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN Vol. 22, No. 8B, Janvier 1980 New York US V.L. RIDEOUT: "Fabrication method for high performance mesfet", pages 3861-3863 * Figures 1,2 * | Examination | US4029522 | JPS52128077 | - "Patent Abstracts of Japan", vol. 2, no 11, 26-01-1978 |