EP0023868 - Optical device for access to an information carrier track and optical memory system comprising such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.1984 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.1984 [1984/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1982/21] |
Former [1981/06] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bricot, Claude "THOMSON-CSF" SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Leterme, Dominique "THOMSON-CSF" SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1981/06] | Representative(s) | Wang, Pierre, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann 75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/06] | Wang, Pierre, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 80401133.6 | 31.07.1980 | [1981/06] | Priority number, date | FR19790019973 | 03.08.1979 Original published format: FR 7919973 | [1981/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0023868 | Date: | 11.02.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0023868 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/12, G11B7/00 | [1981/06] | CPC: |
G11B7/12 (EP,US);
G11B7/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1981/06] | Title | German: | Optische Vorrichtung zum Spurzugriff eines Informationsträgers und optisches Speichersystem mit einer solchen Vorrichtung | [1981/06] | English: | Optical device for access to an information carrier track and optical memory system comprising such a device | [1981/06] | French: | Dispositif optique d'accès à une piste portée par un support d'information et système de mémoire optique comportant un tel dispositif | [1981/06] | Examination procedure | 23.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/18] | 28.08.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.12.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP53147504 [ ]; | JP52119952 [ ]; | JP54039103 [ ]; | FR2291663 [ ] (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | FR2312091 [ ] (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [AD]FR2325953 (THOMSON BRANDT [FR]); | DE2634243 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [X]FR2399087 (MCA DISCO VISION [US]); | [X]FR2403575 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | DE2801062 [ ] (JACOBS ELI S); | [P]GB2022914 (HITACHI LTD); | [P]FR2440055 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACT OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 18, 16 février 1979, page 127, E-91, & JP-A-53 147 504 (YONEZAWA), & JP53147504 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 2, no. 6, 17 janvier 1978, page 9921, E-77, & JP-A-52 119 952 (CANON), & JP52119952 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 60, 23 mai 1979, page 133, E-112, & JP-A-54 039 103 (NIPPON VICTOR), & JP54039103 A 00000000 | Examination | - Aide-mémoire de Physique par B. YAVORSKI et al, Traduction française, Editions MIR (PARIS) 1975 |