EP0026135 - Method of testing a digital data transmission line between two modems and device for carrying out this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1987 [1987/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIGNES TELEGRAPHIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES L.T.T. 1, rue Charles Bourseul F-78702 Conflans-Ste-Honorine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | For all designated states LIGNES TELEGRAPHIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES L.T.T. 1, rue Charles Bourseul F-78702 Conflans-Ste-Honorine / FR | ||
Former [1981/13] | For all designated states LIGNES TELEGRAPHIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES Société anonyme 1 Rue Charles Bourseul F-78702 Conflans-Ste Honorine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gregoire, Michel "THOMSON-CSF" - SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Vuillemin, Jean-Claude "THOMSON-CSF" - SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1981/13] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/16] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | ||
Former [1981/13] | Benoit, Monique THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 80401317.5 | 16.09.1980 | [1981/13] | Priority number, date | FR19790023241 | 18.09.1979 Original published format: FR 7923241 | [1981/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0026135 | Date: | 01.04.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0026135 | Date: | 08.01.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/24 | [1981/13] | CPC: |
H04L1/242 (EP,US);
H04L1/241 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [1981/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Prüfen einer Digitaldatenübertragungsleitung zwischen zwei Modems und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | [1981/13] | English: | Method of testing a digital data transmission line between two modems and device for carrying out this method | [1981/13] | French: | Procédé de test d'une ligne de transmission de données numériques entre deux modems et dispositif mettant en oeuvre ce procédé | [1981/13] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/43] | 02.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3976835 [ ] (LARNER DOUGLAS STANLEY, et al); | FR2317829 [ ] (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | US3786187 [ ] (DE VITA L, et al) |