EP0026145 - Process for making products based on calcium silicates and/or calcium aluminates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.12.1987 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1987 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 10.02.1988 [1988/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAFARGE COPPEE 28, rue Emile Ménier 75782 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | For:FR
ANVAR Agence Nationale de Valorisation de la Recherche 43, rue Caumartin F-75436 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | For all designated states ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE Service National, 2, rue Louis Murat 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states LAFARGE COPPEE 28, rue Emile Ménier F-75782 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | ||
For:FR
ANVAR Agence Nationale de Valorisation de la Recherche 43, rue Caumartin F-75436 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | |||
For all designated states ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE Service National 2, rue Louis Murat F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
Former [1984/15] | For all designated states LAFARGE COPPEE 28, rue Emile Ménier F-75782 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | ||
For:FR
ANVAR Agence Nationale de Valorisation de la Recherche 43, rue de Caumartin F-75436 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | |||
For all designated states ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE Service National 2, rue Louis Murat F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
Former [1981/28] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
GB
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
LAFARGE COPPEE 28, rue Emile Ménier F-75782 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | ||
For:FR
ANVAR Agence Nationale de Valorisation de la Recherche 43, rue de Caumartin F-75436 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | |||
For all designated states ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE Service National 2, rue Louis Murat F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
Former [1981/13] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
GB
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
LAFARGE COPPEE 28, rue Emile Ménier F-75782 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | ||
For:FR
ANVAR Agence Nationale de Valorisation de la Recherche 43, rue de Caumartin F-75436 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moisset, Jacques 2, Domaine de la Forêt F-78112 Fourqueux / FR | 02 /
Bonet, Claude 342, rue Basse F-45590 Saint-Cyr en Val / FR | 03 /
Rouanet, Alain Résidence Grand Soleil F-66120 Font-Romeu / FR | 04 /
Petit, Alain Châlet Poc à Poc Lotissement Las Coumes d'Adal-Superbolquère F-66210 Mont-Louis / FR | 05 /
Delmas, Robert Bolquère F-66210 Mont-Louis / FR | 06 /
Gold, Dieter Immeuble Le Caillou Avenue F. Arago F-66120 Font-Romeu / FR | 07 /
Chauvin, Gérard Dep. Ch. Process Engineery Hieriot Watt University Chambers Street Edinbourg EH A1 1HX / GB | [1984/06] |
Former [1984/04] | 01 /
Moisset, Jacques 2, Domaine de la Forêt F-78112 Fourqueux / FR | ||
02 /
Bonet, Claude 342, rue Basse F-45590 Saint-Cyr en Val / FR | |||
03 /
Rouanet, Alain Résidence Grand Soleil F-66120 Font-Romeu / FR | |||
04 /
Petit, Alain Châlet Poc à Poc Lotissement Las Coumes d'Adal-Superbolquère F-66210 Mont-Louis / FR | |||
05 /
Delmas, Robert Bolquère F-66210 Mont-Louis / FR | |||
06 /
Gold, Dieter Immeuble Le Caillou Avenue F. Arago F-66120 Font-Romeu / FR | |||
07 /
Chauvin, Gérard Dep. Ch. Process Engineery Hieriot Watt University Chambers Street Edinbourg EH A1 1HX / GB | |||
Former [1984/03] | 01 /
Moisset, Jacques 2, Domaine de la Forêt F-78112 Fourqueux / FR | ||
02 /
Bonet, Claude 342, rue Basse F-45590 Saint-Cyr En Val / FR | |||
03 /
Rouanet, Alain Résidence Grand Soleil F-66120 Font-Romeu / FR | |||
04 /
Petit, Alain Lotissement Las Coumes d'Adal-Superbolquére F-66210 Mont-Louis / FR | |||
05 /
Delmas, Robert Bolquère F-66210 Mont-Louis / FR | |||
06 /
Gold, Dieter Immeuble Le Caillou Avenue F. Arago F-66120 Font-Romeu / FR | |||
07 /
Chauvin, Gérard Dep. Ch. Process Engineery Hieriot Watt University Chambers Street Edinbourg EH A1 1HX / GB | |||
Former [1981/31] | 01 /
Moisset, Jacques 2, Domaine de la Forêt F-78112 Fourqueux / FR | ||
02 /
Bonet, Claude 342, rue Basse F-45590 Saint-Cyr En Val / FR | |||
03 /
Rouanet, Alain Résidence Grand Soleil F-66120 Font-Romeu / FR | |||
04 /
Petit, Alain Châlet Poc à Poc Lotissement Las Coumes d'Adal-Superbolquére F-66210 Mont-Louis / FR | |||
05 /
Delmas, Robert Bolquère F-66210 Mont-Louis / FR | |||
06 /
Gold, Dieter Immeuble Le Caillou Avenue F. Arago F-66120 Font-Romeu / FR | |||
07 /
Chauvin, Gérand Dep. Ch. Process Engineery Heriot Watt University Chambers Street Edinburgh EHA1 1HX / GB | |||
Former [1981/22] | 01 /
Moisset, Jacques 2, Domaine de la Forêt F-78112 Fourqueux / FR | ||
02 /
Bonet, Claude 342, rue Basse F-45590 Saint-Cyr En Val / FR | |||
03 /
Rouanet, Alain Résidence Grand Soleil F-66120 Font-Romeu / FR | |||
04 /
Petit, Alain Châlet Poc à Poc Lotissement Las Coumes d'Adal-Superbolquére F-66210 Mont-Louis / FR | |||
05 /
Delmas, Robert Bolquère F-66210 Mont-Louis / FR | |||
06 /
Gold, Dieter Immeuble Le Caillou Avenue F. Arago F-66120 Font-Romeu / FR | |||
07 /
Chauvin, Gérard Egat | |||
Former [1981/13] | 01 /
Moisset, Jacques 2, Domaine de la Forêt F-78112 Fourqueux / FR | ||
02 /
Bonet, Claude 342, rue Basse F-45590 Saint-Cyr En Val / FR | |||
03 /
Rouanet, Alain Résidence Grand Soleil F-66120 Font-Romeu / FR | |||
04 /
Petit, Alain Châlet Poc à Poc Lotissement Las Coumes d'Adal-Superbolquére F-66210 Mont-Louis / FR | |||
05 /
Delmas, Robert Bolquère F-66210 Mont-Louis / FR | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/07] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1981/13] | Phélip, Bruno (FR) Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de la Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 80401348.0 | 19.09.1980 | [1981/13] | Priority number, date | FR19790023737 | 24.09.1979 Original published format: FR 7923737 | [1981/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0026145 | Date: | 01.04.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0026145 | Date: | 08.02.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/06] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0026145 | Date: | 10.02.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C04B7/44 | [1981/13] | CPC: |
C04B7/4453 (EP,US);
Y02P40/121 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Produkten auf der Basis von Kalziumsilikaten und/oder -aluminaten | [1981/13] | English: | Process for making products based on calcium silicates and/or calcium aluminates | [1981/13] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de produits à base de silicates et/ou aluminates calciques | [1981/13] | Examination procedure | 24.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/44] | 29.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.06.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.11.1984
03.12.1984
ADMISSIBLE Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz AG Patentwesen PR-P D-51057 Köln / DE | 02
06.11.1984
03.12.1984
ADMISSIBLE Wanke, Susanne Burgkmairstrasse 16 D-8000 München 21 / DE | [1987/24] |
Former [1985/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.11.1984
Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz AG Patentwesen PR-P D-51057 Köln / DE | ||
02
06.11.1984
ADMISSIBLE Wanke, Susanne Burgkmairstrasse 16 D-8000 München 21 / DE | |||
Former [1985/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.11.1984
ADMISSIBLE Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz AG Patentwesen PR-P D-51057 Köln / DE | 04.12.1984 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.04.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.04.1985 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1985 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 20.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 15.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 14.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.08.1987 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 23.10.1987 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [D]DE2230590 (POLYSIUS AG); | FR2235890 [ ] (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND [JP]); | DE1303170 [ ] | [ ] - ZEMENT-KALK-GIPS, no. 6, 1978, J. SVENDSEN: "Alkaliarmer Zement aus Hochalkali-Rohstoffen mit energiewirtschaftlich g}nstiger Verfahrenstechnik", pages 281-284 |