EP0028189 - Nuclear reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.1986 [1986/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel B.P. 510 75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/18] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel B.P. 510 F-75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moutard, Daniel 15, Avenue du Trégor F-78310 Maurepas / FR | 02 /
Pierrat, Robert 46, Boulevard des Américains F-44300 Nantes / FR | [1981/18] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1981/18] | Application number, filing date | 80401493.4 | 21.10.1980 | [1981/18] | Priority number, date | FR19790026871 | 30.10.1979 Original published format: FR 7926871 | [1981/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0028189 | Date: | 06.05.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0028189 | Date: | 20.05.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0028189 | Date: | 30.01.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G21C9/00, G21C13/02 | [1981/18] | CPC: |
G21C9/00 (EP,US);
G21C13/036 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/18] | Title | German: | Kernreaktor | [1981/18] | English: | Nuclear reactor | [1981/18] | French: | Chaudière nucléaire | [1981/18] | Examination procedure | 12.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/50] | 24.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2893465 [ ] (MUELLER FRANK H, et al); | [A]DE2261477 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]FR2337409 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [X]FR2203041 (KERNFORSCHUNGSANLAGE JUELICH [DE]); | [A]FR2282698 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) | Examination | FR2265152 |