EP0029391 - Decorative strip covering the edge of a panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.1983 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/21] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée F-75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Game, Pierre 2, rue Métayer F-95540 Mery sur Oise / FR | [1981/21] | Representative(s) | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al Cabinet Weinstein 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/21] | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al Cabinet Z. Weinstein 20, Avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 80401636.8 | 14.11.1980 | [1981/21] | Priority number, date | FR19790028214 | 15.11.1979 Original published format: FR 7928214 | [1981/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0029391 | Date: | 27.05.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/06 | [1981/21] | CPC: |
B60J10/277 (EP);
B60J10/21 (EP);
B60J10/265 (EP);
B60J10/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1981/21] | Title | German: | Zierleiste zur Abdeckung von Scheibenrändern | [1981/21] | English: | Decorative strip covering the edge of a panel | [1981/21] | French: | Enjoliveur destiné à habiller le bord d'un panneau | [1981/21] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 19.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/52] | 12.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1983/42] | 08.07.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1279492 [ ]; | US3774363 [ ]; | US4035017 [ ]; | US3093844 [ ] |