EP0029779 - Process and apparatus for producing glass fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.1986 [1986/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VETROTEX SAINT-GOBAIN 767 quai des Allobroges F-73000 Chambéry / FR | [1981/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Faure, Jean-Paul Tornery Chignin F-73800 Montmelian / FR | 02 /
Renaudin, Jean Pierre Begon Saint-Sulpice F-73160 Cognin / FR | 03 /
Lecron, Jacques 35 rue du Mont Jovet F-73000 Bissy Chambery / FR | 04 /
Manera, Maxime 12 rue de Sécheron Jacob Bellecombette F-73000 Chambery / FR | [1985/14] |
Former [1981/22] | 01 /
Faure, Jean-Paul Tornery Chignin F-73800 Montmelian / FR | ||
02 /
Renaudin, Jean Pierre Begon Saint-Sulpice F-73160 Cognin France / FR | |||
03 /
Lecron, Jacques 35 rue du Mont Jovet F-73000 Bissy Chambery / FR | |||
04 /
Manera, Maxime 12 rue de Sécheron Jacob Bellecombette F-73000 Chambery / FR | Representative(s) | Eudes, Marcel, et al Saint-Gobain Recherche 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93304 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/14] | Eudes, Marcel, et al Saint-Gobain Recherche 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc F-93304 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1981/22] | Eudes, Marcel SOFAB, 4, rue Diderot F-92156 Suresnes Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 80401652.5 | 18.11.1980 | [1981/22] | Priority number, date | FR19790028538 | 20.11.1979 Original published format: FR 7928538 | [1981/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0029779 | Date: | 03.06.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0029779 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/08, C03B37/02 | [1981/22] | CPC: |
C03B37/0213 (EP,US);
C03B37/0209 (EP,US);
C03B37/083 (EP,US);
Y02P40/57 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1981/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat zur Herstellung von Glasfasern | [1981/22] | English: | Process and apparatus for producing glass fibres | [1981/22] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la fabrication de fibres de verre | [1981/22] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1981 | Examination requested [1982/04] | 12.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1433657 [ ] (OWENS CORNING FIBERGLASS CORP); | US2775850 [ ] (STALEGO CHARLES J); | US3574581 [ ] (STRICKLAND EDWARD T, et al); | US4032314 [ ] (COGGIN JR CHARLES H); | US3468643 [ ] (STALEGO CHARLES J, et al); | FR2425409 [ ] (NITTO BOSEKI CO LTD [JP]); | BE876072 [ ] (NITTO BOSEKI CO LTD); | FR2334637 [ ] (KAISER GLASS FIBER CORP [US]) |