EP0033045 - Prefabricated straight stairway [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pace, Raymond 165, Avenue de la Dhuys 93170 Bagnolet / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/31] | For all designated states Pace, Raymond 165, Avenue de la Dhuys F-93170 Bagnolet / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/31] | Representative(s) | Dupuy, René Gaston Cabinet René G. Dupuy & Jean M.L. Loyer 14, Rue La Fayette F-75009 Paris / FR | [1981/31] | Application number, filing date | 80401852.1 | 23.12.1980 | [1981/31] | Priority number, date | FR19800001404 | 23.01.1980 Original published format: FR 8001404 | [1981/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0033045 | Date: | 05.08.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0033045 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1981 | Classification | IPC: | E04F11/02, E04F11/12 | [1981/31] | CPC: |
E04F11/0255 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/31] | Title | German: | Vorgefertigte geradläufige Treppe | [1981/31] | English: | Prefabricated straight stairway | [1981/31] | French: | Escalier droit préfabriqué | [1981/31] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 28.01.1982 | Examination requested [1982/15] | 15.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 28.11.1984 | NL | 28.11.1984 | SE | 28.11.1984 | BE | 31.12.1984 | [1999/42] |
Former [1991/51] | NL | 28.11.1984 | |
SE | 28.11.1984 | ||
BE | 31.12.1984 | ||
Former [1989/17] | NL | 28.11.1984 | |
SE | 28.11.1984 | ||
Former [1986/15] | NL | 28.11.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | FR2309685 [ ] | Examination | DE2509464 | US3299590 |