EP0032355 - Fibre reinforced composite material and process for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1985 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VEREINIGTE ALUMINIUM-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Berlin - Bonn Postfach 2468 Georg-von-Boeselager-Strasse 25 D-53117 Bonn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/29] | For all designated states VEREINIGTE ALUMINIUM-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Berlin - Bonn Postfach 2468 Georg-von-Boeselager-Strasse 25 D-53117 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ibe, Gerhard, Dr. Auweg 12 D-5330 Königswinter / DE | 02 /
Gruhl, Wolfgang, Prof. Dr. Kaninsberg 7 D-5300 Bonn-Holzlar / DE | [1981/29] | Representative(s) | Müller-Wolff, Thomas VAW aluminium AG Patentbateilung Postfach 2468 53014 Bonn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Müller-Wolff, Thomas VAW aluminium AG Patentbateilung Postfach 2468 53014 Bonn / DE | ||
Former [1981/29] | Müller-Wolff, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. VAW aluminium AG Georg-von-Boeselager-Strasse 25 Postfach 2468 D-53014 Bonn / DE | Application number, filing date | 80710024.3 | 10.10.1980 | [1981/29] | Priority number, date | DE19803000171 | 04.01.1980 Original published format: DE 3000171 | DE19803033725 | 08.09.1980 Original published format: DE 3033725 | [1981/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0032355 | Date: | 22.07.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0032355 | Date: | 09.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C22C1/09, B32B15/20 | [1981/29] | CPC: |
C22C47/20 (EP);
C22C49/04 (EP);
B22F2998/00 (EP);
B22F2999/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, B22F3/1035 (EP);
B22F2999/00, C22C47/20, B22F3/14, B22F3/18 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/29] | Title | German: | Faserverstärkter Verbundwerkstoff und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1981/29] | English: | Fibre reinforced composite material and process for its production | [1981/29] | French: | Matériau composite renforcé par des fibres et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1981/29] | Examination procedure | 31.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/46] | 07.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.10.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2330336 [ ] | [ ] - JOURNAL OF METALS, Band 27, Heft 5, Mai 1975 W.C. HARRIGAN et al.: "Aluminium graphite composites; Effects of processing on mechanical properties", Seiten 20 und 21 * Seite 20, linke Spalte, Absatz 2 * | Examination | FR2133317 | DE2657685 | US3936277 | US3795042 | DE2756014 |