EP0027428 - Electric machine with a stator pack of laminations fashioned as an insertion unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/16] | Electric machine with a parcel of stator plates fashioned as an insertion unit | ||
[1984/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.1985 [1985/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/16] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Günter, Jaap Münchener Strasse 48 D-1000 Berlin 30 / DE | [1981/16] | Application number, filing date | 80730064.5 | 10.09.1980 | [1981/16] | Priority number, date | DE19792941484 | 10.10.1979 Original published format: DE 2941484 | [1981/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0027428 | Date: | 22.04.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0027428 | Date: | 23.12.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0027428 | Date: | 04.07.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/18 | [1981/16] | CPC: |
H02K1/185 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, FR, GB, LI, SE [1981/16] | Title | German: | Elektrische Maschine mit einem als Einschieber ausgebildeten Ständerblechpaket | [1981/16] | English: | Electric machine with a stator pack of laminations fashioned as an insertion unit | [1984/27] | French: | Machine électrique ayant un paquet insérable de tôles statoriques | [1981/16] |
Former [1981/16] | Electric machine with a parcel of stator plates fashioned as an insertion unit | Examination procedure | 28.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 23.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.12.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE7819560U [ ]; | DE2513130 [ ]; | DE2121881 [ ] |