EP0014176 - Electrically driven vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sbarro, Francesco 28, Route de Lausanne 1422 Les Tuileries-de-Grandson / CH | For all designated states Vessa, société anonyme de construction de vehicules electriques, de developpement et de recherche Rue du Lac 115 Clarens chez SRE CH-1820 Montreux (Kanton Waadt) / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/16] | For all designated states Sbarro, Francesco Route de Lausanne CH-1411 Les Tuileries-de-Grandson Kanton Waadt / CH | ||
For all designated states Vessa, société anonyme de construction de vehicules electriques, de developpement et de recherche Rue du Lac 115 Clarens chez SRE CH-1820 Montreux (Kanton Waadt) / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sbarro, Francesco Route de Lausanne CH-1411 Les Tuileries-de-Grandson / CH | [1980/16] | Representative(s) | Bovard, Fritz Albert, et al Bovard & Cie. Patentanwälte VSP-Rechtsanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 CH-3000 Bern 25 / CH | [1980/16] | Application number, filing date | 80810009.3 | 09.01.1980 | [1980/16] | Priority number, date | CH19790000180 | 09.01.1979 Original published format: CH 18079 | [1980/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0014176 | Date: | 06.08.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0014176 | Date: | 22.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B60K1/04 | [1980/16] | CPC: |
B60K1/04 (EP,US);
B60L50/66 (EP);
B60L53/80 (EP,US);
B60K2001/0472 (EP);
B60L2270/40 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/16] | Title | German: | Elektrowagen | [1980/16] | English: | Electrically driven vehicle | [1980/16] | French: | Voiture électrique | [1980/16] | Examination procedure | 02.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/16] | 01.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.06.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 22.12.1982 | AT | 09.01.1983 | LU | 31.01.1983 | [1999/52] |
Former [1985/25] | SE | 22.12.1982 | |
AT | 09.01.1983 | ||
Former [1983/43] | SE | 22.12.1982 | Documents cited: | Search | FR749462 [ ]; | FR798464 [ ] (VEHICULES ET TRACTEURS ELECTR); | FR2387814 [ ] (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD [GB]) | Examination | - Automobiltechnisches Handbuch, Bussien, 2-Band, Berlin 1965, S. 896,897 | - Die Fahrgestelle der Pkw, Stuttgart 1956, S. 234-241 |