EP0013666 - Phenanthroline derivatives, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.1981 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/15] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haas, Georges, Dr. Im Rehwechsel 24 CH-4102 Binningen / CH | 02 /
Jaeggi, Knut A., Dr. General Guisan-Strasse 44 CH-4054 Basel / CH | 03 /
Rossi, Alberto, Dr. Bündtenweg 30 CH4104 Oberwil / CH | 04 /
Sele, Alex Langmattstrasse 14 CH-4132 Muttenz / CH | [1980/15] | Application number, filing date | 80810010.1 | 10.01.1980 | [1980/15] | Priority number, date | CH19790000402 | 16.01.1979 Original published format: CH 40279 | [1980/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0013666 | Date: | 23.07.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/47, // C07D215/26, C07D215/38 ,(C07D471/04, 221:00, 221:00) | [1980/15] | CPC: |
C07D215/38 (EP,US);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07D215/26 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/15] | Title | German: | Neue Phenanthrolinderivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, diese enthaltende pharmazeutische Präparate und ihre Verwendung | [1980/15] | English: | Phenanthroline derivatives, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | [1980/15] | French: | Dérivés de la phénanthroline, procédé pour leur préparation et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1980/15] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 14.01.1980 | Examination requested [1980/15] | 13.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1981 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1981/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2149692 [ ] (ICI LTD); | DE2554772 [ ] (FISONS LTD) |