EP0020297 - Cyclic phosphoric acid ester amides, process for their preparation and their use as stabilizers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/25] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rasberger, Michael, Dr. Waltersgrabenweg 6 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | [1980/25] | Application number, filing date | 80810158.8 | 09.05.1980 | [1980/25] | Priority number, date | CH19790004504 | 15.05.1979 Original published format: CH 450479 | [1980/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0020297 | Date: | 10.12.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0020297 | Date: | 13.04.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.08.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/24, C07F9/65, C08K5/51, // C10M1/44 | [1980/25] | CPC: |
C07F9/6578 (EP,US);
C07F9/657154 (EP,US);
C08K5/5399 (EP,US);
C10M137/16 (EP,US);
C10M2223/02 (EP,US);
C10M2223/049 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1980/25] | Title | German: | Zyklische Phosphorsäureesteramide, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Stabilisatoren | [1980/25] | English: | Cyclic phosphoric acid ester amides, process for their preparation and their use as stabilizers | [1980/25] | French: | Esters amides cycliques de l'acide phosphorique, leur procédé de préparation et leur utilisation comme stabilisants | [1980/25] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 12.05.1980 | Examination requested [1980/25] | 29.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.10.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | SU179918 [ ]; | US3297631 [ ] (BOWN DELOS E, et al); | FR2354337 [ ] (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 82, 1975, Zusammenfassung Nr. 58628v, Seite 41, Columbus, Ohio, US, N.A. MUKMENEVA et al.: "Inhibiting action of some dialkyl(aryl) phosphorous acids" & VYSOKOMOL. SOEDIN. SER.B, 1974, 16(8), 635-7 * Zusammenfassung * |