EP0030208 - Pliers for inserting sliders in curtain rods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/23] | Curtain-fastening pliers | ||
[1984/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.1984 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bachmann, Margrit Sandackerweg 6 CH-3363 Oberönz / CH | [1981/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bachmann, Alfred Sandackerweg 6 CH-3363 Oberönz / CH | [1981/23] | Representative(s) | Gasser, François W. Patentanwalt und Lizenzberater, Reiterstrasse 5A 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1981/23] | Gasser, François W. Patentanwalt und Lizenzberater, Reiterstrasse 5A CH-3013 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 80810159.6 | 09.05.1980 | [1981/23] | Priority number, date | CH19790010368 | 21.11.1979 Original published format: CH 1036879 | [1981/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0030208 | Date: | 10.06.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0030208 | Date: | 15.02.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A47H13/00, B25B7/02 | [1981/23] | CPC: |
B25B7/02 (EP,US);
A47H13/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/539 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53943 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1981/23] | Title | German: | Zange für das Einsetzen von Vorhanggleitern in Profil-Vorhangschienen | [1984/07] | English: | Pliers for inserting sliders in curtain rods | [1984/07] | French: | Pince pour l'introduction des éléments coulissants dans un rail à rideaux | [1984/07] |
Former [1981/23] | Montierzange für Vorhänge | ||
Former [1981/23] | Curtain-fastening pliers | ||
Former [1981/23] | Pince de montage pour rideaux | Examination procedure | 27.05.1981 | Examination requested [1981/31] | 22.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.05.1984 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | FR200559 [ ]; | FR442780 [ ] (MICHAEL RIEDL [AT]); | US1360199 [ ] (DOOLITTLE SHERWOOD G); | FR2094551 [ ] (THIERRY GEORGES); | US4073179 [ ] (HICKEY ROBERT J, et al) |