EP0020299 - Nickel complexes of azines, their preparation process, pigmenting process for a high molecular organic material and the material so obtained [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/25] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iqbal, Abul, Dr. Im Schaiengarten 1 CH-4107 Ettingen / CH | 02 /
Lienhard, Paul, Dr. Kirschgartenstrasse 14 CH-4402 Frenkendorf / CH | 03 /
Pugin, André, Dr. Grenzacherweg 301 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | [1980/25] | Application number, filing date | 80810162.0 | 14.05.1980 | [1980/25] | Priority number, date | CH19790004842 | 23.05.1979 Original published format: CH 484279 | [1980/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0020299 | Date: | 10.12.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0020299 | Date: | 09.02.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/12, C09B57/04, C08K5/34 | [1980/25] | CPC: |
C09B26/02 (EP,US);
C09B57/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1980/25] | Title | German: | Nickelkomplexe von Azinen, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung, Verfahren zum Pigmentieren hochmolekularen organischen Materials sowie das so enthaltene Material | [1980/25] | English: | Nickel complexes of azines, their preparation process, pigmenting process for a high molecular organic material and the material so obtained | [1980/25] | French: | Complexes de nickel d'azines, procédé pour leur préparation, procédé de pigmentation d'un matériau organique de poids moléculaire élevé ainsi que le matériau ainsi obtenu | [1980/25] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1980 | Examination requested [1980/25] | 08.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 11.11.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.08.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4022770 [ ] (L EPLATTENIER FRANCOIS, et al); | US4024132 [ ] (L EPLATTENIER FRANCOIS, et al) |