EP0022753 - Halogenated cyanine dyes with three nuclei, method of preparation of the same, use of them as sensitizers in direct positive photographic materials, direct positive photographic material with a content of trinuclear halogenated cyanine dyes and use of this direct positive photographic material for the production of direct positive images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1981/03] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steiger, Rolf, Dr. Russille CH-1724 Praroman / CH | 02 /
Reber, Jean François, Dr. Impasse de la Colline 2 CH-1723 Marly / CH | [1981/03] | Application number, filing date | 80810226.3 | 11.07.1980 | [1981/03] | Priority number, date | CH19790006632 | 17.07.1979 Original published format: CH 663279 | CH19790009418 | 19.10.1979 Original published format: CH 941879 | [1981/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0022753 | Date: | 21.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0022753 | Date: | 03.11.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/485, C09B23/12 | [1981/03] | CPC: |
C09B23/12 (EP,US);
G03C1/18 (EP,US);
G03C1/4853 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1981/03] | Title | German: | Trinukleare halogenierte Cyaninfarbstoffe, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, ihre Verwendung als Sensibilisatoren in direktpositiven photographischen Materialien, direktpositives photographisches Material mit einem Gehalt an trinuklearen halogenierten Cyaninfarbstoffen und Verwendung des direktpositiven photographischen Materials zur Herstellung direktpositiver Bilder | [1981/03] | English: | Halogenated cyanine dyes with three nuclei, method of preparation of the same, use of them as sensitizers in direct positive photographic materials, direct positive photographic material with a content of trinuclear halogenated cyanine dyes and use of this direct positive photographic material for the production of direct positive images | [1981/03] | French: | Colorants de cyanines halogénées à trois noyaux, procédé pour leur préparation, leur utilisation comme sensibilisateurs dans des matériaux photographiques positifs directs, matériau photographique positif direct contenant des colorants de cyanines halogénées à trois noyaux et utilisation de ce matériau photographique positif direct pour la production d'images positives directes | [1981/03] | Examination procedure | 16.07.1980 | Examination requested [1981/03] | 10.06.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.02.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1498876 [ ] (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG); | DE2540957 [ ] (AGFA GEVAERT AG); | DE2057617 [ ]; | US3501309 [ ] (GILMAN PAUL B, et al) |