EP0029010 - Electric storage heater [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'INDUSTRIELLE D'EQUIPEMENT Plateau du Gua F-12110 Aubin / FR | [1981/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trouilhet, Yves Chemin des Tattes, 4b CH-1222 Vesenaz / CH | [1981/20] | Representative(s) | Dousse, Blasco, et al 73, Avenue de Mategin 1217 Meyrin-Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1981/20] | Dousse, Blasco, et al 7, route de Drize CH-1227 Carouge/Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 80810341.0 | 06.11.1980 | [1981/20] | Priority number, date | CH19790010039 | 09.11.1979 Original published format: CH 1003979 | [1981/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0029010 | Date: | 20.05.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0029010 | Date: | 12.10.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F24H9/18, F24H7/04 | [1981/20] | CPC: |
F24H7/0416 (EP);
F24H9/1863 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1981/20] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Heizgerät mit Speicherung | [1981/20] | English: | Electric storage heater | [1981/20] | French: | Appareil de chauffage électrique à accumulation | [1981/20] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 25.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 14.12.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.10.1983 | IT | 12.10.1983 | NL | 12.10.1983 | SE | 12.10.1983 | LU | 30.11.1983 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 12.10.1983 | |
IT | 12.10.1983 | ||
NL | 12.10.1983 | ||
SE | 12.10.1983 | ||
LU | 30.11.1983 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 12.10.1983 | |
IT | 12.10.1983 | ||
NL | 12.10.1983 | ||
SE | 12.10.1983 | ||
Former [1985/25] | AT | 12.10.1983 | |
NL | 12.10.1983 | ||
SE | 12.10.1983 | ||
Former [1984/28] | NL | 12.10.1983 | |
SE | 12.10.1983 | ||
Former [1984/06] | SE | 12.10.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | GB975560 [ ] (HEATOVENT ELECTRIC LTD); | FR1542246 [ ] (BUDERUS EISENWERK); | DE1914156 [ ] (TUERK & HILLINGER KG); | DE1778165 [ ] (MUCKENFUSS SOEHNE MALAG); | DE2123493 [ ] |