EP0029412 - Bleachable dyestuffs, process for their preparation and their use in photographic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.1982 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1981/21] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Postle, Stephen Roderick Springdale 29 Goodwood Avenue Hutton, Brentwood Essex CM13 1QD / GB | [1981/21] | Application number, filing date | 80810350.1 | 13.11.1980 | [1981/21] | Priority number, date | GB19790039970 | 19.11.1979 Original published format: GB 7939970 | [1981/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0029412 | Date: | 27.05.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0029412 | Date: | 02.12.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C09B23/14, G03C1/84 | [1981/21] | CPC: |
C09B23/04 (EP,US);
C09B23/143 (EP,US);
G03C1/83 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1981/21] | Title | German: | Bleichbare Farbstoffe, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung in photographischem Material | [1981/21] | English: | Bleachable dyestuffs, process for their preparation and their use in photographic material | [1981/21] | French: | Colorants blanchissables, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation dans des matériaux photographiques | [1981/21] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 15.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/21] | 10.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1982 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1982/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1250947 [ ]; | FR1240138 [ ] (SANDOZ SA); | US3424756 [ ] (FISHER JOHN G, et al); | US3247215 [ ] (FISHER JOHN G, et al); | US3141018 [ ] (STRALEY JAMES M, et al); | FR1245386 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY); | FR1038333 [ ] |