EP0023892 - Process and apparatus for sterilizing liquids by ultraviolet radiation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.1983 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.1984 [1984/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vighi, Temistocle Via Battibue, 14 I-43100 Parma / IT | [1981/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/06] | Representative(s) | Paini, Sergio B.go del Parmigianino, 17 43100 Parma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1981/06] | Paini, Sergio, Dr. B.go del Parmigianino, 17 I-43100 Parma / IT | Application number, filing date | 80830053.7 | 21.07.1980 | [1981/06] | Priority number, date | IT19790024779 | 31.07.1979 Original published format: IT 2477979 | [1981/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0023892 | Date: | 11.02.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/10, C02F1/32 | [1981/06] | CPC: |
C02F1/325 (EP);
A61L2/10 (EP);
C02F2201/3227 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entkeimen von Flüssigkeiten mittels Ultraviolettstrahlen | [1981/06] | English: | Process and apparatus for sterilizing liquids by ultraviolet radiation | [1981/06] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la stérilisation des liquides en général avec rayons ultra-violets | [1981/06] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 17.08.1981 | Examination requested [1982/38] | 16.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/06] | 04.11.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.08.1981 | M02   Fee paid on   21.09.1981 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1983 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR413233 [ ] (VICTOR HENRI [FR], et al); | DE888446 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | CH330145 [ ] (KELLER HANS [CH]); | US3061721 [ ] (AL BRENNER); | FR80549E [ ]; | US3182193 [ ] (SIDNEY ELLNER, et al); | GB1167578 [ ] (ULTRA DYNAMICS CORP [US]); | DE1916540 [ ] (KELLER HANS, et al); | US3672823 [ ] (BOUCHER RAYMOND MARCEL GUT); | US3923663 [ ] (REID WILLIAM P); | DE2551622 [ ] (WIEST REINER DIPL ING); | DE2622637 [ ] (BOEHNENSIEKER FRANZ) |