EP0022104 - Control system for limiting the power output of a hydraulic servomotor assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/01] | A device for limiting the power output of a hydraulic assembly | ||
[1984/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1985 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akermans Verkstad AB Bruksgatan 5 Box 115 S-241 00 Eslöv / SE | [1981/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tordenmalm, Lars Östen Diskusvägen 6 S-240 17 Södra Sandby / DE | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Lenz, Franz, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | Lenz, Franz, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 S-200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 80850088.8 | 12.06.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | SE19790005272 | 15.06.1979 Original published format: SE 7905272 | [1981/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0022104 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0022104 | Date: | 06.05.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0022104 | Date: | 30.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F15B1/00, F15B11/16, F15B21/08, F04B49/10 | [1984/22] | CPC: |
F16H61/478 (EP,US);
F02D29/04 (EP,US);
F15B21/087 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1981/01] | F15B1/00, F15B21/08, F04B49/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1981/01] | Title | German: | Regelsystem zur Leistungsbegrenzung einer hydraulischen Servomotoranordnung | [1984/22] | English: | Control system for limiting the power output of a hydraulic servomotor assembly | [1984/22] | French: | Système de réglage pour limitation de puissance d'un système hydraulique à servomoteurs | [1984/22] |
Former [1981/01] | Leistungsbegrenzer für hydraulisches System | ||
Former [1981/01] | A device for limiting the power output of a hydraulic assembly | ||
Former [1981/01] | Dispositif de limitation de puissance d'un système hydraulique | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 03.09.1981 | Examination requested [1981/45] | 06.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.05.1984 | FR | 30.05.1984 | [2002/24] |
Former [1985/25] | AT | 30.05.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4017219 (BORN ELLIS H, et al); | [X]US4017218 (BURK DUANE L, et al); | [X]US4017216 (MOORE HUBER A); | [X]US4029439 (ADAMS CECIL E) |