EP0029420 - Novel halophenyl-pyridyl-allylamine derivatives, processes and intermediates as well as pharmaceutical preparations thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.1984 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astra Läkemedel Aktiebolag Strängnäsvägen 44 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/21] | For all designated states Astra Läkemedel Aktiebolag Strängnäsvägen 44 S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Högberg, Thomas Vallmostigen 5 S-153 00 Järna / SE | 02 /
de Paulis, Tomas Östergatan 6A S-151 43 Södertälje / SE | 03 /
Ross, Svante Bertil Hedvägen 8 S-151 52 Södertälje / SE | 04 /
Ulff, Carl Bengt Johan Ägärdevägen 9 S-151 47 Södertälje / SE | [1981/21] | Representative(s) | Wurm, Bengt Runio, et al Patent and Trade Mark Department AB ASTRA 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/21] | Wurm, Bengt Runio, et al Patent and Trade Mark Department AB ASTRA S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | Application number, filing date | 80850172.0 | 14.11.1980 | [1981/21] | Priority number, date | SE19790009514 | 16.11.1979 Original published format: SE 7909514 | [1981/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0029420 | Date: | 27.05.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/38, A61K31/44 | [1981/21] | CPC: |
C07D213/30 (EP,US);
A61P25/24 (EP);
C07D213/26 (EP,US);
C07D213/38 (EP,US);
C07D213/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/21] | Title | German: | Halogenphenyl-pyridyl-allylaminderivate, Verfahren und Zwischenprodukte sowie deren pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | [1981/21] | English: | Novel halophenyl-pyridyl-allylamine derivatives, processes and intermediates as well as pharmaceutical preparations thereof | [1981/21] | French: | Dérivés de (halogénophénylpyridylallyl)amines, procédés et intermédiaires et leurs compositions pharmaceutiques | [1981/21] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 19.11.1981 | Examination requested [1982/04] | 04.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 24.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1985/01] | Divisional application(s) | EP83200107.7 / EP0081478 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2676964 [ ] (NATHAN SPERBER, et al); | DE966534 [ ] (SCHERING CORP); | US3928613 [ ] (BERNTSSON PEDER BERNHARD, et al) |