Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.05.1986 [1986/20] |
22.03.1985 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.1985 [1985/21] |
17.03.1982 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.05.1982 [1982/20] |
21.07.1981 | Publication of search report | published on 23.09.1981 [1981/38] |
09.05.1981 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.07.1981 [1981/27] |