Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE880894 | 16.04.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | BE198773 | 27.12.1979 | BE880894 | 27.12.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0031804 | Global Dossier | 22.05.1985 | B1 | EP0031804 | 23.09.1981 | A3 | EP0031804 | 08.07.1981 | A2 | Priority number | Date | BE198773 | 27.12.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3070682D1 | 27.06.1985 | D1 | Priority number | Date | BE198773 | 27.12.1979 |