EP0037872 - Cardan drive for motorcycles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1985 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.1985 [1985/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leitner, Horst Dr.-Th.-Körner-Strasse 33 A-8600 Bruck a.d. Mur Steiermark / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1981/42] | For all designated states Leitner, Horst Dr.-Th.-Körner-Strasse 33 A-8600 Bruck a.d. Mur Steiermark / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/42] | Representative(s) | Beer, Otto, et al Lindengasse 8 1071 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1981/42] | Beer, Otto, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lindengasse 8 A-1071 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 80890042.7 | 11.04.1980 | [1981/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0037872 | Date: | 21.10.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0037872 | Date: | 23.12.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037872 | Date: | 11.04.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B62M17/00 | [1981/42] | CPC: |
B62M17/00 (EP);
B62K25/283 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/42] | Title | German: | Kardanantrieb für Motorräder | [1981/42] | English: | Cardan drive for motorcycles | [1981/42] | French: | Transmission à cardan pour motocyclettes | [1981/42] | Examination procedure | 08.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/24] | 24.06.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | AT177074B [ ] (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | DE1041379 [ ] (KLAUE HERMANN); | DE1071518 [ ]; | DE1055981 [ ] (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG); | DE805119 [ ] (NSU WERKE AG); | FR847807 [ ] (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG); | FR507495 [ ] (PEDER ANDERSEN FISKER [DK]); | DE707199 [ ] (AUDI AG); | FR1036316 [ ]; | GB752035 [ ] (ZUENDAPP WERKE GMBH); | GB710098 [ ] (INNOCENTI SOC GENERALE); | FR509852 [ ] (EMBOUTISSAGE ET DE CONST MECAN); | US2077628 [ ] (JORDAN LE GRAND L); | EP0014416 [ ] (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) |