EP0033824 - Heat-sealable packaging material and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.1986 [1986/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEICH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Weinburg-Mühlhofen 4 3200 Obergrafendorf / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1981/33] | For all designated states TEICH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Weinburg-Mühlhofen 4 A-3200 Obergrafendorf / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reiterer, Franz Brunnengasse 24 A-3200 Obergrafendorf / AT | [1981/33] | Representative(s) | Stampfer, Heinz ISOVOLTA Österreichische Isolierstoffwerke AG Industriezentrum NÖ-Süd 2351 Wiener Neudorf / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1981/33] | Stampfer, Heinz ISOVOLTA Österreichische Isolierstoffwerke AG Industriezentrum NÖ-Süd A-2351 Wiener Neudorf / AT | Application number, filing date | 80890148.2 | 12.12.1980 | [1981/33] | Priority number, date | AT19790007827 | 12.12.1979 Original published format: AT 782779 | [1981/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0033824 | Date: | 19.08.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0033824 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B65D65/00 | [1981/33] | CPC: |
B65D77/2024 (EP);
B29C65/18 (EP);
B29C65/4815 (EP);
B29C65/5057 (EP);
B29C66/112 (EP);
B29C66/131 (EP);
B29C66/53461 (EP);
B29C66/723 (EP);
B29C66/73116 (EP);
B29C66/80 (EP);
B29C66/81427 (EP);
B29C66/81431 (EP);
B29C66/8322 (EP);
B29C66/91421 (EP);
B29C66/919 (EP);
B29C66/91933 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29C66/72321 (EP);
B29C66/7234 (EP);
B29C66/73115 (EP);
B29C66/81422 (EP);
B29K2023/12 (EP);
B29K2027/06 (EP);
B29K2031/04 (EP);
B29K2101/12 (EP);
B29K2305/02 (EP);
B29K2995/0067 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1984/38] |
Former [1981/33] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Heissiegelfähiges Verpackungsmaterial, sowie dessen Verwendung | [1981/33] | English: | Heat-sealable packaging material and its use | [1981/33] | French: | Matériau d'emballage scellable à chaud et son utilisation | [1981/33] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 08.02.1982 | Examination requested [1982/16] | 02.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.01.1981 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   12.03.1981 | 12.01.1981 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   12.03.1981 | 12.01.1981 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   12.03.1981 | 12.01.1981 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   12.03.1981 | 12.01.1981 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   12.03.1981 | 12.01.1981 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   12.03.1981 | 12.01.1981 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   12.03.1981 | 12.01.1981 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   12.03.1981 | 12.01.1981 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   12.03.1981 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2254473 [ ] (KRAFTCO CORP); | DE2434020 [ ] (SCHUEPBACH AG); | DE2703531 [ ] (LINNICH PAPIER & KUNSTSTOFF) |