EP0020692 - TEMPERATURE COMPENSATED FILL VALVE/PRESSURE SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.1982 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION 100 Erieview Plaza Cleveland Ohio 44114 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION 100 Erieview Plaza Cleveland Ohio 44114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIGRIN, Robert Steven 24140 Union Street Dearborn, MI 48124 / US | 02 /
BROWN, James Matthew 14865 Markese Allen Park, MI 48101 / US | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Slight, Geoffrey Charles, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/10] | Slight, Geoffrey Charles, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | ||
Former [1981/01] | Slight, Geoffrey Charles Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 80900066.4 | 05.11.1979 | [1981/01] | WO1979US00946 | Priority number, date | US19780974284 | 29.12.1978 Original published format: US 974284 | [1981/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8001435 | Date: | 10.07.1980 | [1980/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0020692 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H01H35/24 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
B60C23/0494 (EP,US);
B60C23/0408 (EP,US);
B60C23/20 (EP,US);
H01H35/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1981/01] | Title | German: | FÜLLVENTIL/DRUCKSCHALTER MIT TEMPERATURAUSGLEICH | [1981/01] | English: | TEMPERATURE COMPENSATED FILL VALVE/PRESSURE SWITCH | [1981/01] | French: | SOUPAPE DE REMPLISSAGE/COMMUTATEUR DE PRESSION COMPENSE POUR LA TEMPERATURE | [1981/01] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.1980 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.1980 | Search fee paid | 05.09.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/10] | 15.01.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1982/50] | 05.09.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3487348 (LINSALATO ORONZO L); | [A]US3743801 (BROBECK W, et al); | [X]US3889077 (HAYASHI TADASHI); | [A]US3908105 (SCHULER HOWARD M); | [A]US4117281 (LEIMBACH RICHARD C); | [XE]US4177671 (ICHIHARA ISAO [JP], et al); | [XE]US4181831 (MAYER WILLIAM R [US], et al) |