EP0024092 - DISC BRAKE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1983 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GARLOCK INC. P.O.Box 8090 Longview, TX 75601 / US | [1981/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENTON, Dennis N. 609 Dogwood Place Gastonia, NC 28052 / US | [1981/08] | Representative(s) | Röse, Horst, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Inge. Röse, Kosel & Sobisch, Odastrasse 4a 37581 Bad Gandersheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/08] | Röse, Horst, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Inge. Röse, Kosel & Sobisch, Odastrasse 4a D-37581 Bad Gandersheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 80900542.4 | 19.02.1980 | [1981/08] | WO1980US00221 | Priority number, date | US19790014354 | 23.02.1979 Original published format: US 14354 | [1981/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8001828 | Date: | 04.09.1980 | [1980/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0024092 | Date: | 25.02.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F16D55/224, F16C27/02, F16C33/12 | [1981/08] | CPC: |
F16D55/22655 (EP,US);
F16C27/063 (EP,US);
F16C2361/45 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/18] |
Former [1981/08] | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | SCHEIBENBREMSE UND VERFAHREN | [1981/08] | English: | DISC BRAKE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD | [1981/08] | French: | FREIN A DISQUES ET PROCEDE | [1981/08] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.1980 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.1980 | Search fee paid | 09.10.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/08] | 18.11.1980 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, LU, NL, SE | 05.02.1981 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1983/13] | 14.12.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.1982 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2031537 [ ] (KELSEY HAYES CO) | International search | [X]US3097893 (WHITE CHARLES S); | [X]US3372960 (FISHER JULIAN V); | [X]US3375906 (JAMES HAYES EDWARD); | [A]US3442354 (BELART JUAN); | [A]US3779828 (CLARK G); | [A]US4039053 (MEYER YVES, et al); | [T]US4199159 (EVANS ANTHONY C [US]); | [X]GB1388116 (DURWARD CLARKSON CO LTD) | [X] - Published 1978, pages 5-185-19. |