EP0028609 - Use of chloronitrophenyl derivatives as selective herbicides and new chloronitrophenyl derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/20] | HERBICIDES | ||
[1983/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.1984 [1984/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEGFRIED AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT CH-4800 Zofingen / CH | [1981/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIELE, Kurt Rebbergstrasse 47d. CH-4800 Zofingen / CH | 02 /
GEISSMANN, Felix Brittnauerstrasse 28 CH-4800 Zofingen / CH | 03 /
MOLNAR, Istvan Eschenweg 10 CH-4800 Zofingen / CH | 04 /
SCHÄREN, Walter Lärchenfeld 440 CH-4803 Vordemwald / CH | 05 /
MEYER, Jacques Obere Brühlstrasse 1 CH-4800 Zofingen / CH | [1981/20] | Representative(s) | Ritscher, Thomas, et al Ritscher & Partner AG Resirain 1 8125 Zollikerberg / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1981/20] | Ritscher, Thomas, Dr., et al RITSCHER & SEIFERT Patentanwälte VSP Kreuzstrasse 82 CH-8032 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 80900764.4 | 08.05.1980 | [1981/20] | WO1980CH00056 | Priority number, date | CH19790004548 | 16.05.1979 Original published format: CH 454879 | [1981/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8002493 | Date: | 27.11.1980 | [1980/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0028609 | Date: | 20.05.1981 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0028609 | Date: | 27.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/30] | Classification | IPC: | A01N33/18, A01N37/48, A01N43/50, C07C79/22, C07C79/36, C07C79/46, C07C103/22, C07C121/68, C07C109/10, C07D233/44 | [1981/20] | CPC: |
C07C255/00 (EP);
A01N33/18 (EP);
A01N35/02 (EP);
A01N35/04 (EP);
A01N37/48 (EP);
A01N39/04 (EP);
A01N43/50 (EP);
C07C205/26 (EP);
C07C205/42 (EP);
C07C205/45 (EP);
C07C205/56 (EP);
C07C243/32 (EP);
C07D233/48 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1981/20] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Chlornitrophenylderivaten als selektive Herbizide und neue Chlornitrophenylderivate | [1983/30] | English: | Use of chloronitrophenyl derivatives as selective herbicides and new chloronitrophenyl derivatives | [1983/30] | French: | Utilisation de dérivés de chloronitrophényle comme herbicides sélectifs et nouveaux dérivés de chloronitrophényle | [1983/30] |
Former [1981/20] | HERBIZIDE | ||
Former [1981/20] | HERBICIDES | ||
Former [1981/20] | HERBICIDES | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.1980 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/20] | 16.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.01.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3009806 ; | [A]US3547619 ; | [A]FR1291128 ; | US3474090 [ ]; | GB1246305 [ ]; | FR1568656 [ ]; | [A]BE760968 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 77, Nr. 3, 17. Juli 1972, Columbus, Ohio, US, CHAMBERLAIN V.H. u.a.: "Plant growth regulating substances, XXXIII Infleunce of ring substituents on the plant growth regulating activity of phenylacetic acid", Zusammenfassung Nr. 15433g seite 166, siehe das ganze Artikel. Ubereinstimmend mit Ann. App. Biol. Band 69, Nr. 1, 1971, Seiten 65-72 (In der Anmeldung angefuhrt). |