EP0035037 - MICROCRYSTALLINE THIN STRIP FOR MAGNETIC MATERIAL HAVING HIGH MAGNETIC PERMEABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/36] | MICROCRYSTALLINE THIN STRIP FOR MAGNETIC MATERIAL WITH HIGH MAGNETIC PERMEABILITY, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND THIN STRIP PRODUCTS | ||
[1984/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.1985 [1985/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO SPECIAL METAL CO., LTD. 22, Kitahama 5-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/36] | For all designated states SUMITOMO SPECIAL METAL CO., LTD. 22, Kitahama 5-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Esashi, Kiyoyuki 20-41, Rokumanji-cho 1-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579 / JP | 02 /
Minatono, Hisae Nyoidani Jyutaku 3-507, 22-1 Nyoidani Minoo-shi Osaka 562 / JP | [1984/50] |
Former [1982/36] | 01 /
ESASHI, Kiyoyuki 20-41, Rokumanji-cho 1-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579 / JP | ||
02 /
Nyoidani Jyutaku 3-507, 22-1 Nyoidani Noyidani Jyutaru 3-507 22-1 Nyoidani Minoo-shi Osaka 562 / JP | |||
Former [1982/18] | 01 /
ESASHI, Kiyoyuki 20-41, Rokumanji-cho 1-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579 / JP | ||
02 /
MINATONO, Hisae Noyidani Jyutaru 3-507 22-1 Nyoidani Minoo-shi Osaka 562 / JP | |||
Former [1981/36] | 01 /
ESASHI, Kiyoyuki 20-41, Rokumanji-cho 1-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579 / JP | ||
02 /
MINATONO, Hisae 22-1, Nyoidani Minoo-shi Osaka 562 / JP | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/36] | Whalley, Kevin, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 80900837.8 | 10.05.1980 | [1981/36] | WO1980JP00100 | Priority number, date | JP19790060714 | 16.05.1979 Original published format: JP 6071479 | [1981/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8002620 | Date: | 27.11.1980 | [1980/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0035037 | Date: | 09.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0035037 | Date: | 12.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/16, C22C38/12, C22C33/00, G11B5/16 | [1981/36] | CPC: |
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
B22D11/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C45/02 (EP,US);
H01F1/14791 (EP,US);
H01F1/15308 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1981/36] | Title | German: | MIKROKRISTALLINER DÜNNER STREIFEN FÜR MAGNETISCHES MATERIAL MIT HOHER MAGNETISCHER PERMEABILITÄT | [1984/50] | English: | MICROCRYSTALLINE THIN STRIP FOR MAGNETIC MATERIAL HAVING HIGH MAGNETIC PERMEABILITY | [1984/50] | French: | FINE BANDE MICROCRISTALLINE POUR MATERIAU MAGNETIQUE DE HAUTE PERMEABILITE MAGNETIQUE | [1984/50] |
Former [1981/36] | MIKROKRISTALLINER DÜNNER STREIFEN FÜR MAGNETISCHES MATERIAL MIT HOHER MAGNETISCHER PERMEABILITÄT, VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND PRODUKTE MIT DÜNNEN STREIFEN | ||
Former [1981/36] | MICROCRYSTALLINE THIN STRIP FOR MAGNETIC MATERIAL WITH HIGH MAGNETIC PERMEABILITY, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND THIN STRIP PRODUCTS | ||
Former [1981/36] | FINE BANDE MICROCRISTALLINE POUR MATERIAU MAGNETIQUE DE HAUTE PERMEABILITE MAGNETIQUE, SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION, ET PRODUITS A BANDE FINE | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.1981 | Translation filed | 05.06.1981 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.1981 | Search fee paid | 05.06.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/36] | 13.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPH1095080B [ ]; | DE2856795 [ ] (TSUYA NOBORU PROF); | US4257830 [ ] (TSUYA NOBORU, et al) | International search | [X]JPS5149115 (YAMAMOTO TATSUJI); | [A]JPS51138517 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]JPS52123314 (DENKI JIKI ZAIRIYOU KENKIYUUSH); | [X]JPS5318422 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [P]JPS5480203 (TSUYA NOBORU) |