EP0028627 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING POLYPEPTIDE ALPHA-THYMOSINE AND DERIVATIVES THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1985 [1985/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Bunsenstrasse 10 D-37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/31] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Bunsenstrasse 10 D-37073 Göttingen / DE | ||
Former [1981/20] | For all designated states MAX-PLANCK-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER WISSENSCHAFTEN E.V. Bunsenstrasse 10 D-3400 Göttingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIRR, Christian Eichendorffstrasse 31 D-6906 Leimen/St. Ilgen / DE | 02 /
STOLLENWERK, Ulrich Kastellweg 17 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | [1984/19] |
Former [1981/52] | 01 /
BIRR, Christian Eichendorffstrasse 31 D-5160 Düren / DE | ||
02 /
STOLLENWERK, Ulrich Kastellweg 17 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | |||
Former [1981/33] | 01 /
BIRR, Christian(verstorben) c/o Paul und Margot Stollenwerk, Holzstrasse 12 | ||
02 /
STOLLENWERK, Ulrich Kastellweg 17 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | |||
Former [1981/20] | 01 /
BIRR, Christian Eichendorffstrasse 31 D-6906 Leimen/St. Ilgen / DE | ||
02 /
STOLLENWERK, Ulrich Kastellweg 17 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | Representative(s) | Huber, Bernhard, et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/20] | Huber, Bernhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80901003.6 | 14.05.1980 | [1981/20] | WO1980DE00067 | Priority number, date | DE19792919592 | 15.05.1979 Original published format: DE 2919592 | [1981/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8002560 | Date: | 27.11.1980 | [1980/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0028627 | Date: | 20.05.1981 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0028627 | Date: | 09.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/19] | Classification | IPC: | C07C103/52, A61K37/02 | [1981/20] | CPC: |
C07K14/57581 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
Y10S930/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1981/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON THYMOSIN-ALPHA1 UND DERIVATEN DAVON | [1981/20] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING POLYPEPTIDE ALPHA-THYMOSINE AND DERIVATIVES THEREFROM | [1981/20] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREFABRICATION DU POLYPEPTIDE THYMOSINE-ALPHA1 ET DE DERIVES DE CELUI-CI | [1981/20] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.1980 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/29] | 09.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.10.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4116951 (WANG SU-SUN) | [X] - Angewandte Chemie, Int. Ed. Band 18, No. 5, Mai 1979 (Weinheim DT), Ch. Birr und U. Stollenwerk: "Synthesis of Thymosin alpha1, a polypeptide of the Thymus" Seiten 394-395, siehe das ganze Dokument, ubereinstimmend mit Angewandte Chemie, Band 92, Seite 422, 1979. | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 91, No. 7, 13. August 1979 (Columbus, Ohio, USA) CH. BIRR et al.: "Preparative merits of the mixed anhydride (MA) method in the excess use of D d Z - amino - acids in the peptide synthesis of biologically active new antamanide analogs", siehe seite 758, Spalte 1, Zusammenfassung Nr. 57489z. Int. J. Pept. Protein. Res. 1979, 13(3) 287-295. |