EP0051581 - BURNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.1982 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.1982 [1982/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KREUZINGER, Franz Mengesstrasse 5 D-35423 Lich / DE | For all designated states HABERLE, Walter Gronauer Weg 16 D-61118 Bad Vilbel / DE | For all designated states HABERLE, Helmuth Gronauer Weg 16 D-6368 Bad Vilbel / DE | [1982/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/20] | Application number, filing date | 80901036.6 | 20.05.1980 | [1982/20] | WO1980DE00071 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8103373 | Date: | 26.11.1981 | [1981/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0051581 | Date: | 19.05.1982 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/20] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | F23D11/40, F23D11/00 | [1982/20] | CPC: |
F23D11/402 (EP);
F23D11/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1982/20] | Title | German: | BRENNER FÜR FEUERUNGSANLAGEN | [1982/20] | English: | BURNER | [1982/20] | French: | BRULEUR | [1982/20] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 29.06.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1982/50] | 10.09.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]DE2849943 ; | CH168969 [ ]; | DE2108880 [ ]; | CH575573 [ ]; | [A]CH428058 ; | US2606604 [ ] |