EP0028634 - Method for producing cobalt metal powder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/20] | Method for producing cobaltic hexamine compounds and cobalt metal powder | ||
[1984/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.1985 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.1985 [1985/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GTE Products Corporation One Stamford Forum Stamford, CT 06904 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/20] | For all designated states GTE PRODUCTS CORPORATION One Stamford Forum Stamford, CT 06904 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GINGERICH, Richard G.W. 201 York Avenue Towanda, PA 18848 / US | 02 /
Mc CLINTIC, Robert P. R.D. No.1, Monroeton Bradford County, PA 18848 / US | [1981/20] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät, et al Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/20] | Bernhardt, Klaus Reinländer & Bernhardt Patentanwälte Orthstrasse 12 D-8000 München 60 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80901063.0 | 30.04.1980 | [1981/20] | WO1980US00498 | Priority number, date | US19790038970 | 14.05.1979 Original published format: US 38970 | [1981/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8002567 | Date: | 27.11.1980 | [1980/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0028634 | Date: | 20.05.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0028634 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C22B23/04 | [1981/20] | CPC: |
C22B23/0461 (EP,US);
C22B23/0469 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1981/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KOBALTMETALLPULVER | [1984/30] | English: | Method for producing cobalt metal powder | [1984/30] | French: | METHODE DE PRODUCTION DE POUDRE METALLIQUE DE COBALT | [1984/30] |
Former [1981/20] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KOBALT(III)-HEXAMIN-VERBINDUNGEN UND KOBALTMETALLPULVER | ||
Former [1981/20] | Method for producing cobaltic hexamine compounds and cobalt metal powder | ||
Former [1981/20] | METHODE DE PRODUCTION DE COMPOSES D'HEXAMINE COBALTIQUE ET POUDRE METALLIQUE DE COBALT | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.1980 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.1980 | Search fee paid | 25.07.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.1980 | Examination requested [1981/20] | 03.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.10.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]US4208380 (HAMALAINEN MATTI J [FI], et al); | [XP]US4184868 (ACLA HOWARD L [US], et al); | [X]US2826499 (LEO SCHLECHT, et al); | [X]US2879137 (BARE CONRAD B, et al); | [X]US3928530 (BAKKER HERMAN F, et al); | [X]US4093450 (DOYLE BARRY N, et al); | [A]US3933975 (NIKOLIC CVETKO B, et al); | [A]US4108640 (WALLACE HERBERT F, et al); | [A]US3975497 (WIEWIOROWSKI TADEUSZ K, et al); | [AP]US4178172 (HAMALAINEN MATTI J [FI], et al); | [A]US2728636 (HARE JR GEORGE FREDERICK VAN, et al); | [A]DE1583864 ; | [A]DE2319703 (NAT RES DEV) | Examination | FR2397462 | DE1247026 |