EP0028249 - APPARATUS FOR THROTTLING A DRY PULVERIZED SOLID MATERIAL PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.1985 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.1985 [1985/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LOCKHEED MISSILES & SPACE COMPANY, INC. 1111 Lockheed Way Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [1981/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONIN, John Henry 1257 Sargent Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 02 /
MEYER, John William 3124 David Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 03 /
DANIEL, Arnold Dewey, Jr. P.O. Box 112 Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | [1981/19] | Representative(s) | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/19] | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 80901088.7 | 10.04.1980 | [1981/19] | WO1980US00407 | Priority number, date | US19790036578 | 07.05.1979 Original published format: US 36578 | [1981/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8002413 | Date: | 13.11.1980 | [1980/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0028249 | Date: | 13.05.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0028249 | Date: | 04.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B65G25/00, B65G65/00, B65G1/00 | [1981/19] | CPC: |
B01J3/02 (EP);
C10J3/50 (EP);
C10J3/723 (EP);
C10J3/78 (EP);
C10J2200/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1981/19] | Title | German: | APPARAT ZUM DROSSELN EINER PUMPE FÜR TROCKENES PULVERISIERTES MATERIAL | [1984/14] | English: | APPARATUS FOR THROTTLING A DRY PULVERIZED SOLID MATERIAL PUMP | [1981/19] | French: | APPAREIL DE REGLAGE D'UNE POMPE POUR MATERIAUX SOLIDES PULVERISES SECS | [1981/19] |
Former [1981/19] | APPARAT ZUM DROSSELN EINER PUMPE FÜR TROCKENES, PULVERISIERTES, FESTES MATERIAL | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.1980 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.1980 | Search fee paid | 30.12.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/19] | 10.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | WO8002279 [ ] (LOCKHEED MISSILES SPACE [US]) | International search | [X]US3182825 (BRUNO ZELLERHOFF); | [X]US3103311 (KEMPF CLAYTON A); | [A]US1289779 (HOWARD WILLIAM H [US]); | [A]US4120410 (VAN DER BURGT MAARTEN J); | [A]US4034870 (DUCH BERNARD P) |