EP0029847 - HYDROPONIC GROWING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.04.1984 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1984 | Refusal of application | published on 20.06.1984 [1984/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARL, Vincent Paul 2633 Whidby Lane Anaheim, CA 92806 / US | [1981/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/23] | Representative(s) | Jones, Colin, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/23] | Jones, Colin, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 80901256.0 | 10.06.1980 | [1981/23] | WO1980US00697 | Priority number, date | US19790047914 | 12.06.1979 Original published format: US 47914 | [1981/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8002787 | Date: | 24.12.1980 | [1980/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0029847 | Date: | 10.06.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A01G31/02 | [1981/23] | CPC: |
A01G31/06 (EP,US);
A01G2031/006 (EP,US);
Y02P60/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/23] | Title | German: | HYDROPONIK-ANBAUGERÄT | [1981/23] | English: | HYDROPONIC GROWING APPARATUS | [1981/23] | French: | APPAREIL DE CULTURE HYDROPONIQUE | [1981/23] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.1981 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.1981 | Search fee paid | 11.02.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/37] | 20.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1984/25] | 29.12.1983 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1984/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS4528527B ; | [X]US1222648 (MARKS JOHN C [US]); | [X]US2121461 (WIDMANN EUGENE A); | [X]USRE21820E ; | [A]US2971290 (KYLE LESLIE B); | [X]US3352057 (MARCEL FERRAND); | [X]US3365840 (JOHN COOPER ALLEN); | [X]US3534498 (HERRLI PETER); | [A]US3667157 (LONGHINI FERNANDO); | [A]US3841023 (CARLYON R); | [X]US3973316 (MAHER WILLIAM JOSEPH); | [A]USD243113S (HIRSCH MICHAEL J); | [X]US4075785 (JONES JOHN L); | [X]US4083147 (GARRICK LAURENCE JAMES); | [X]US4092803 (NAYLOR THOMAS H); | [X]US4106235 (SMITH WALTON J); | [A]US4118891 (KEHL DONALD K, et al) |