EP0036023 - A METHOD OF ESTIMATING THE INSULATION LIFE OF AN ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE INCORPORATING A RESIN INSULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/38] | METHOD OF ESTIMATING LIFE OF INSULATION FOR ELECTRIC DEVICE USING RESIN INSULATOR | ||
[1985/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1986 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.1986 [1986/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/38] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASAHI, Mitsuyo Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki, Kaisha Chuo Kenkyusho 80, Azanakano Minamishimizu Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661 / JP | 02 /
ENOMOTO, Junzou Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki, Kaisha Chuo Kenkyusho 80, Azanakano Minamishimizu Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Takao Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha Seisangijutsu Kenkyusho 80 Azanakano Minamishimizu Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661 / JP | 04 /
HASHIZUME, Aiichiro Mitsubishi Denki KK Seisangijutsu Kenkyusho 80 Azanakano Minamishimizu Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661 / JP | [1981/38] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Peter William, et al Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [1981/38] | Application number, filing date | 80901332.9 | 18.07.1980 | [1981/38] | WO1980JP00161 | Priority number, date | JP19790096284 | 25.07.1979 Original published format: JP 9628479 | JP19790128355 | 03.10.1979 Original published format: JP 12835579 | [1981/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8100306 | Date: | 05.02.1981 | [1981/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0036023 | Date: | 23.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0036023 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/12 | [1981/38] | CPC: |
G01N33/442 (EP,US);
G01R31/1263 (EP,US);
Y10T436/20 (EP,US);
Y10T436/22 (EP,US);
Y10T436/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1981/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEURTEILEN DER LEBENSDAUER DER ISOLATION EINER EINEN HARZ-ISOLATOR VERWENDENDEN ELEKTRISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [1985/43] | English: | A METHOD OF ESTIMATING THE INSULATION LIFE OF AN ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE INCORPORATING A RESIN INSULATOR | [1985/43] | French: | PROCEDE D'ESTIMATION DE LA DUREE D'ISOLATION D'UN DISPOSITIF ELECTRIQUE UTILISANT UN ISOLATEUR EN RESINE | [1981/38] |
Former [1981/38] | VERFAHREN ZUM BERECHNEN DER LEBENSDAUER DER ISOLATION EINER EINEN HARZ-ISOLATOR VERWENDENDEN ELEKTRISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [1981/38] | METHOD OF ESTIMATING LIFE OF INSULATION FOR ELECTRIC DEVICE USING RESIN INSULATOR | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.1981 | Translation filed | 26.03.1981 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.1981 | Search fee paid | 26.03.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/40] | 06.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.04.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4149161 [ ] (PHILLIPS DAVID C, et al); | DE2652340 [ ] (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG) | International search | [A] - Denki Shikensho 33 (9) (1969 - 9) P131 Table 1, P134-139. | Examination | - ETG FACHBERICHTE 2 (Energietechnische Gesellschaft im VDE) "Daververhalten von Isolierstoffen und Isoliersystemen" 1977 VDE-Verlag GmbH Berlin, DE H. Meyer et al.: "Lebensdauerversuche an Modellen von Wicklungen elektrischer Maschinen", pages 17-21 | - E und M Elektrotechnik und Maschinenbau, vol. 94, no. 6, June 1977 Wien. AT E. KEIL: "Die Untersuchung an Hochspannungsisoliertungen - ein Beitrag zur Beurteilung der Lebensdauer elektrischer Betriebsmittel der Energietechnik", pages 244-250 | - ELEKTROTECHNIK, vol. 60, no. 21 November 1978, Würzburg, DE R. HUBER: "Neue Dielektrika im Test, pages 28, 31, 33 |