Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0039677
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
31.01.1986 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.1986 [1986/12] |
01.08.1985 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.10.1985 [1985/40] |
18.04.1985 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.1985 [1985/25] |
17.12.1984 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.1985 [1985/08] |
27.07.1984 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.09.1984 [1984/39] |
19.09.1981 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.11.1981 [1981/46] |
19.09.1981 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.11.1981 [1981/46] |